THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:50:13 PM
Corrigan, Michael James
CPSO#:
31653
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jan 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael J. Corrigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |