THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 9:38:36 AM
Koudys, Deborah Mary
CPSO#:
31647
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
74 Tetherwood Blvd
London ON N5X 3W3
Phone: 519-671-0253
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Koudys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their recor may contact:
101-1055 Fanshawe Park Rd
London ON N6G 5B4
Tel: 519-472-0040
Date Received: 26 Sep 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH MARY KOUDYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUDYS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1980 |