THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:30:40 PM
Yu, Tak Chi Michael
CPSO#:
31623
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For patients seen before January 30, 2019 at the Bayridge After Hours Clinic, please send an e-mail to: [email protected].
For patients being seen between February 1, 2019 to March 15, 2020, please contact CDK Family clinic,105 Sutherland Drive, Kingston, ON K7K 5V6.
Date Received: 22 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |