THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:48:59 PM
Shear, Neil Hartley
CPSO#:
31499
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 May 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1-700
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Neil H. Shear Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:24 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |