THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:54:22 AM
Rotstein, Coleman Michael Frederick
CPSO#:
31492
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
585 University Ave
9-MaRS-9079
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 6663
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:18 Nov 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLEMAN MICHAEL FREDERICK ROTSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Sep 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1988 |