THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:01:04 PM
Advent, Donald Anthony
CPSO#:
31482
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Donald A. Advent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Paul Howard, Suite 301, 1 Quarry Ridge Road, Barrie, ON L4M 7G1
Tel: (705) 725-0885
Date Received: 19 Jan 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1977 to 15 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Feb 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2002 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |