THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:20:57 PM
Huebsch, Lothar Bernd
CPSO#:
31452
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Sep 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 May 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: University of Ottawa, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Department Of Medicine(Haematology)
501 Smyth Road
Room 7208
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8158
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:25 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOTHAR BERND HUEBSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUEBSCH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 1980 |