THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:12:04 PM
Inculet, Richard Ion
CPSO#:
31448
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Suite E2-122
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6679
Fax: (519) 667-6762
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD ION INCULET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCULET is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1986 |