THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:55:35 AM
Andrejicka, Stefan Emil
CPSO#:
31430
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Andrejicka, Stephen Emil (used until: 24 Jan 2016 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON M6G 2T9
Phone: (519) 661-9675
Fax: (416) 901-7217
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEFAN EMIL ANDREJICKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREJICKA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2000 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2012 |