THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 16:45:09 PM
Seetner, Avron Ashley
CPSO#:
31409
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. Ashley Seetner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 27 Jul 2020
Instructions/Address:504 - 89 Queensway W
Misssissauga, Ontario
L5B 2V2
Date Received: 07 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:18 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |