THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:33:10 AM
Cruess, Alan Foster
CPSO#:
31379
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Mar 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Eye Care Centre
Room 2035-2 West Victoria
1276 South Park St.
Halifax NS B3H 2Y9
Phone: (902) 473-7215
Fax: (902) 473-2839
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:18 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN FOSTER CRUESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUESS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 1980 |