THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 17:50:49 PM
Leibow, Deborah Frances
CPSO#:
31365
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Mar 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Mar 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ava Road
Toronto ON M5P 1Y7
Phone: (416) 487-2743
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH FRANCES LEIBOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIBOW is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 1980 |