THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:24:26 PM
Pommerville, Peter John Joseph Osias
CPSO#:
31360
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
21 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Ottawa, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:20 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 1978 to 15 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Aug 2009 |