THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:51:58 PM
Stein, Raymond David
CPSO#:
31346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Feb 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
415-600 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 961-2933
Fax: (416) 961-3016
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:30 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Feb 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 18 Aug 2023 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 21 Aug 2023 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 21 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 21 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 18 Aug 2023
Summary:
On August 18, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Stein engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in that he:
- invited Patient A to a social event;
- made inappropriate comments towards Patient A; and
- touched Patient A in the following ways: put his arm around her waist in his office; put his arm tightly around her waist at the social event; and grabbed her thigh quite hard at the social event.
Further, Dr. Stein committed disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct when he interfered with the College’s investigation by attempting to persuade a potential witness to provide inaccurate information to the College.
The Tribunal ordered that:
- Dr. Stein attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Stein’s certificate of registration for 6 months commencing August 21, 2023;
- the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Stein’s certificate of registration; and
- Dr. Stein pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by September 18, 2023.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty and Reprimand: 2023-08-18