THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:00:40 AM
Doey, Tamison Marie
CPSO#:
31304
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Feller, Tamison Marie (used until: 15 Apr 1981 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Tamison Doey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 26 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Maryville Family and Adolescent Centre
3640 Wells Ave
Windsor ON N9C 1T9
Date Received: 03 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1978 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 28 Feb 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tamison Marie Doey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 28, 2017:
The College received information about Dr. Doey’s standard of practice, arising from an assessment of her practice. As a result of the assessment, Dr. Doey was required to complete professional education in mental health law.
Prior to completing the professional education, Dr. Doey ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.