THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:35:47 PM
Neale, Richard William
CPSO#:
31287
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
25 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of London, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jan 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Dec 1984 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 25 Jun 1985 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Jun 1985
Summary:
In June 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Neale incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Neale(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Jun 1985