THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:23:30 PM
Finkelstein, Sheldon Charles
CPSO#:
31280
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jan 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S.C. Finkelstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 8 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:P.O Box 35030, 1421 Grand Marais West, Windsor, ON N9E 4V0
Date Received: 21 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2015 |