THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:40:12 AM
Mycyk, Taras Roman
CPSO#:
31244
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7 Cherry Lane
Riverside Estates SK S7T 1A2
Phone: (306) 477-1118
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TARAS ROMAN MYCYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYCYK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 1985 |