THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:14:02 AM
Tavernier, Joseph
CPSO#:
31231
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Nov 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dartmouth Medical School, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. E. Tavernier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:883 Victoria Street
Midland, Ontario
L4R 1B7
Date Received: 12 Aug 2020
Instructions/Address:
Paitents seeking a copy of their medical records can do so by contacting:
Tel: 705-526-3338
Date Received: 15 Mar 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Aug 2020 |