THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:16:39 PM
Gupta, Madhulika Agarwal
CPSO#:
31206
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Agarwal, Madhulika (used until: 20 Jul 1982 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
585 Springbank Drive
London ON N6J 1H3
Phone: (519) 641-1001
Fax: (519) 641-1033
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
USA - California
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1980 |
CFPC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MADHULIKA AGARWAL GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1979 |