THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:09:56 AM
Locke, Carolynne Elizabeth
CPSO#:
31191
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bagshaw, Carolynne Elizabeth (used until: 14 Mar 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site |
Paris |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1980 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLYNNE ELIZABETH LOCKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2023 |