THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:41:08 AM
Prokopiw, Igor
CPSO#:
31187
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 May 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Feb 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:04 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 May 2005 |