THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:41:31 PM
Bubela, Constantine Boris
CPSO#:
31180
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Oct 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-3312
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CONSTANTINE BORIS BUBELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUBELA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2019 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On August 17, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Oshawa, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Bubela.