THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:53:23 AM
Sajo, Iidiko Mary
CPSO#:
31168
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Dec 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Woburn Medical Dental Centre at: 4129 Lawrence Avenue East, Scarborough, ON, M1E 2S2, or via telephone: 416-439-1991, or via Fax: 416-439-3593.
Date Received: 11 Feb 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1979 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Jan 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Mar 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Iidiko Mary Sajo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 16, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sajo engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family medicine practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Sajo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)