THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:29:22 PM
Thornley, Glenn Douglas
CPSO#:
31163
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Glenn Thornley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:28 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2022 |