THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:02:58 AM
De Villiers, Rocco Arthur
CPSO#:
31158
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1768 Main Street West
Unit 2
Hamilton, ON L8S 1H1
Date Received: 15 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:25 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |