THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 17:21:32 PM
Brison, Robert James
CPSO#:
31153
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Moffatt Brison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1980 |
CFPC Specialist |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:26 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2023 |