THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 15:02:29 PM
Lamond, Roderick Gow
CPSO#:
31143
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
13 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:27 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1979 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 27 Oct 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 1995 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2015 |