THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:56:58 PM
Formoso, Alfredo Feraren
CPSO#:
31142
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
07 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Sep 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Formoso-de Guzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical record location as per above.
Merivale Medical Imaging
1370 Clyde Ave
Ottawa, ON K2G 3H8
Date Received: 06 Mar 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2018 |