THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:33:39 PM
Hajek, Vlasta Eva
CPSO#:
31101
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: Masaryk University of Brno, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
32 De Vere Gardens
Toronto ON M5M 3E7
Date Received: 29 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:01 Jan 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |