THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:43:43 AM
Nag, Sukriti
CPSO#:
31080
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Lucknow, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rush Alzheimer's Disease Center
Jelke, Suite 1000
Rush Univ Med Center
1750 W Harrison Avenue
Chicago IL 60612
United States
Phone: (312) 942-2269
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:05 Apr 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUKRITI NAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1979 |