THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:59:30 AM
Stilwell, Moira Evelyn
CPSO#:
31041
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Dec 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2013 |