THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:28:44 AM
Edwards, Lesley Christine
CPSO#:
31036
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Aug 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2006 Old Second Line Road, Kanata ON, K2K 1X7
Date Received: 01 Apr 2015
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Room 0350
A/L 0700C
200 Tunney's Pasteur Driveway
Ottawa, Ontario
K1A 0K9
Tel: (613) 957-4667
Fax: (613) 946-0639
Date Received: 06 Jul 2010
Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
PO Box 72060
RPO Kanata North
Kanata, ON
K2K 2P4
Date Received: 13 May 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:16 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2015 |