THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:33:36 AM
Isles, Katherine
CPSO#:
31035
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
1 Eva Road
Toronto ON M9C 4Z5
Phone: (416) 231-7968
Fax: (416) 231-7982
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Occupational Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHERINE ISLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISLES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
Other - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1979 |