THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:51:48 AM
Sanford, Mark Neville
CPSO#:
31021
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Feb 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Aug 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Otago, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Aug 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Feb 2006 |