THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:05:29 PM
Perl, Avishay
CPSO#:
31000
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Hebrew
Education: University of Basel, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Professional Centre
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 413
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 626-8416
Fax: (416) 626-9286
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Avishay Perl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 9 2021
Corporation Name: DR. AVISHAY PERL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:25 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AVISHAY PERL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1979 |