THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 3:33:52 AM
Hercz, Gavril
CPSO#:
30982
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Apr 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Complete Kidney Care Centre
Department of Nephrology
Humber River Hospital
200 Church Street
Toronto ON M9N 1N8
Phone: (416) 658-2241
Fax: (416) 658-2242
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
West Park Healthcare Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nephrology |
Effective:09 Sep 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAVRIL HERCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERCZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 1986 |