THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:35:13 AM
Livshin, Oleg
CPSO#:
30978
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
12 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
12-Aug-2023
Former Name:
Livshits, Oleg (used until: 20 Mar 1984 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: First Moscow Order of Lenin Medical Inst, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: O. Livshin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2023
Corporation Name: O. LIVSHIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 21 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1977 |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 12 Aug 2023 |