THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:54:25 PM
Boettcher, Allen David
CPSO#:
30949
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bingham Memorial Hospital
507 8th Ave
Matheson ON P0K 1N0
Phone: (705) 273-2424
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bingham Memorial Hospital |
Matheson |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLEN DAVID BOETTCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOETTCHER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jul 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2010 |