THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:50:32 AM
Bidmead, Nicholas Rodney
CPSO#:
30911
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jul 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Mar 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2010 |