THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:01:10 PM
Kirshen, Albert Jacob
CPSO#:
30865
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Oct 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
149 York Hill Blvd
Thornhill ON L4J 2P5
Phone: 6474442851
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. J. Kirshen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Siani Health System in regards to obtaining your medical records:
416-586-4800 ext. 2649
Date Received: 02 Mar 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALBERT JACOB KIRSHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSHEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2023 |