THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:22:37 AM
Tihal, Hirawan
CPSO#:
30852
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Tihal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hamilton Academy of Medicine
206 - 1 Young St
Hamilton, ON L8N 1T8
Date Received: 15 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2018 |