THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:20:57 PM
Emond, Michael Gerard Joseph
CPSO#:
30829
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J Emond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kincardine Family Health Team, 44 Queen Street, Kincardine, Ontario
N2Z 3C2 Tel: (519) 396-2700
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Dec 2018 |