THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:45:56 PM
Fisher, Barbara Jean
CPSO#:
30807
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Apr 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8600
Fax: (519) 685-8627
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:01 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARBARA JEAN FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1985 |