THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:28:42 AM
Chan, Roy Kwok-Yau
CPSO#:
30749
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2 Antrim Crescent, Unit 5
Scarborough ON M1P 2N3
Phone: (416) 2929909
Fax: 416 7834547
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROY KWOK-YAU CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Aug 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 1980 |