THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:30:03 AM
Cervin, Catherine Ksenie
CPSO#:
30743
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jul 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1993 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 29 Nov 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |