THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:29:32 PM
Harris, Kenneth Arthur
CPSO#:
30737
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kenneth Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2012
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Command Services (London) Limited
100 Piccadilly Street
London, Ontario
N6A 1R8
Date Received: 16 Apr 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:27 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |