THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 11:15:47 AM
Cameron, Glenna Gillis
CPSO#:
30668
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7575 16th Sideroad
Bolton ON L7E 5R7
Phone: (647) 458-1235
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. G. Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GLENNA GILLIS CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2006 |