THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:25:38 AM
Morris, Patricia Ellen
CPSO#:
30647
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Apr 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P.E. Morris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: 416-398-0638
Fax: 416-398-5932
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 30 Jul 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |