THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:10:47 PM
Serezo, Paterno Castillo
CPSO#:
30580
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: University of The East Philippines, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paterno C. Serezo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients requesting a copy of their medical records may write to Dr. Serenzo at: 195 Margaret Avenue, Wallaceburg ON, N8A 2A4.
Date Received: 15 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |